CO HB1275 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Real Property Purchase Shooting Range
Title
Real Property Purchase Shooting Range
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-31 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-02 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2014-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |