CO HB1268 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that a referral agency make disclosures to a prospective resident of an assisted living residence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assisted Living Residence Referral Disclosures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1268 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1268 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Governor Signed
2019-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-17SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-04-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-09HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-05HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1268
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1268_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1268_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1268_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1268_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1268_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1268_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/337001dff243b932872583d300649089-hb19-1268-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1268vote5514b4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36936f0398311289872583df00635627-hb19-1268-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1268vote5a2921

Bill Comments

feedback