CO HB1267 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning criminal offenses for failure to pay wages, and, in connection therewith, implementing recommendations from the Colorado human trafficking council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penalties For Failure To Pay Wages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1267 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Governor Signed
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-22SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-18SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-04-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-09HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-08HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-05HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1267
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1267_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1267_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1267_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1267_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1267_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c95b15e5ad561568872583d1000035ea-hb19-1267-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c95b15e5ad561568872583d1000035ea-hb19-1267-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c95b15e5ad561568872583d1000035ea-hb19-1267-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c95b15e5ad561568872583d1000035ea-hb19-1267-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1267vote54e5e3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ccfcbfbb4bdadef8872583e0006de838-hb19-1267-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1267vote581c52

Bill Comments

feedback