CO HB1266 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning allowing persons who were convicted of misdemeanors for marijuana-related behaviors that are no longer illegal to petition for the sealing of criminal records relating to such convictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seal Misdemeanor Marijuana Conviction Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1266 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1266 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1266 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1266, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1266, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1266, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment T). (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment S). (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1266, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06 Governor Signed
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-05-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-05-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2017-05-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2017-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2017-04-27HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2017-03-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1266
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1266_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1266_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1266_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1266_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1266_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1266_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-27t133719z-hb17-1266-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-05-01t133933z-hb17-1266-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-05-02t080552z-hb17-1266-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#1252
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-05-01t133933z-hb17-1266-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-05-05t134230z-hb17-1266-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-27t133719z-hb17-1266-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-27t133719z-hb17-1266-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-27t133719z-hb17-1266-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-05-09t084133z-hb17-1266-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback