CO HB1259 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/07/2015 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/07/2015 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Residential Precipitation Collection Rain Barrels
Title
Residential Precipitation Collection Rain Barrels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006. No action was taken on this motion. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006. No action was taken on this motion. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion failed on a vote of 4-8. (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1259 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006. No action was taken on this motion. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006. No action was taken on this motion. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion failed on a vote of 4-8. (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1259 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/07/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Lay Over Amended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2015-03-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |