CO HB1258 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

FAMLI Insurance Program Wage Replacement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAMLI Insurance Program Wage Replacement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1258, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment L) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Fina The motion passed on a vote of 7-6. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
2015-04-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-22HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-03-19HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
2015-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment + Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/63AD9D4A5FC6A3CA87257DB10065C86D?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/63AD9D4A5FC6A3CA87257DB10065C86D/$FILE/1258_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/63AD9D4A5FC6A3CA87257DB10065C86D/$FILE/1258hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/63AD9D4A5FC6A3CA87257DB10065C86D/$FILE/1258fin.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/63AD9D4A5FC6A3CA87257DB10065C86D/$FILE/1258app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/63AD9D4A5FC6A3CA87257DB10065C86D/$FILE/1258_eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5CDBDB784B4F1B4687257E0E0008A3EC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E9A736575F5C5FE787257E0E000664B8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B8905B8496315B8487257E0E00068489
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4F2C9500BB88559D87257E2F007D2176
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A128F43F0E325C3987257E31005012B9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/73A8E7D6DB57830387257E3100500978
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6ACCE8EFCEC90E7587257E2F007C9D2C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4F2C9500BB88559D87257E2F007D2176

Bill Comments

feedback