CO HB1256 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning electronic filing of certain taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Filing Of Certain Taxes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1256 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1256 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-17SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2019-04-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-03HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1256
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1256_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1256_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1256_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1256_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1256_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1256_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f04a2cbb67a54d0872583d1006c23b0-hb19-1256-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1256vote5933ad
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c9f5c068c4f55766872583df006e3e6f-hb19-1256-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1256vote5a2907

Bill Comments

feedback