CO HB1256 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
South Platte Water Storage Study
Title
South Platte Water Storage Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1256 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1256, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1256, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1256, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1256 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1256, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1256, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1256, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-11 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-03 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2016-05-03 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2016-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-07 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations |