CO HB1253 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a general fund transfer to the local government severance tax fund to fund grants to local governments for renewable and clean energy infrastructure projects, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable And Clean Energy Project Grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1253 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1253 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Governor Signed
2021-06-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-18SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2021-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-22HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1253
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1253_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1253_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1253_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1253_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1253_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1253_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1253_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1253_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1253_sn2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/68eb7cc6ff163321872586bf006c001d-hb21-1253-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/da64f403f931d3f0872586c5004f1288-hb21-1253-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1253vote565255
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d08c4718051588bf872586d900700f5d-hb21-1253-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/924d79b2502eccda872586e30051001e-hb21-1253-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1253vote5f3dc5

Bill Comments 750

feedback