CO HB1252 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the collection of court costs from persons who are convicted of criminal offenses.
Title
Courts Collect Costs From Criminal Offenders
Sponsors
Sen. Joann Ginal [D] | Sen. Owen Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1252 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1252 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1252 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1252 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |