CO HB1251 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
DNA Collection Misdemeanor Convictions
Title
DNA Collection Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Pabon [D] | Sen. John Morse [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1251 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1251 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 9-4. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 9-4. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1251 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 9-4. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 9-4. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2013-04-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over |
2013-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-18 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-11 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |