CO HB1250 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Explore Performance-based Utility Regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Explore Performance-based Utility Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1250 indefinitely (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1250 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1250 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
2015-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-03-25HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance
2015-02-27HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback