CO HB1250 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School Dist Payments For Floods & Total Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Dist Payments For Floods & Total Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27HouseGovernor Signed
2014-02-19HouseSent to the Governor
2014-02-19HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-02-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-02-17SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-02-14SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2014-02-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-02-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2014-02-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-02-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-02-07HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-02-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C47F92B9C74045A887257C6D006B3D73?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C47F92B9C74045A887257C6D006B3D73/$FILE/1250_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C47F92B9C74045A887257C6D006B3D73/$FILE/1250_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C47F92B9C74045A887257C6D006B3D73/$FILE/1250_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C47F92B9C74045A887257C6D006B3D73/$FILE/1250_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C47F92B9C74045A887257C6D006B3D73/$FILE/1250_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C47F92B9C74045A887257C6D006B3D73/$FILE/1250_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4683DB569FA4265887257C7800571ED4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F81071A787FEE9D387257C7F00530A3D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4683DB569FA4265887257C7800571ED4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F81071A787FEE9D387257C7F00530A3D

Bill Comments

feedback