CO HB1250 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Administer County Landscape Management

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administer County Landscape Management

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1250 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1250 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-05-07HouseSent to the Governor
2013-04-29HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2013-04-28HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2013-04-25HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2013-04-17HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2013-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-04-12SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-09SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-04-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2013-03-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-03-27HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-26HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-03-20HouseHouse Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AB9330C781EEC3C887257B0F005ADEA4?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AB9330C781EEC3C887257B0F005ADEA4/$FILE/1250_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AB9330C781EEC3C887257B0F005ADEA4/$FILE/1250lg_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AB9330C781EEC3C887257B0F005ADEA4/$FILE/1250_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AB9330C781EEC3C887257B0F005ADEA4/$FILE/1250_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AB9330C781EEC3C887257B0F005ADEA4/$FILE/1250sloc_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AB9330C781EEC3C887257B0F005ADEA4/$FILE/1250_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AB9330C781EEC3C887257B0F005ADEA4/$FILE/1250_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AB9330C781EEC3C887257B0F005ADEA4/$FILE/1250_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B89FEBF16666A6D787257B34006B9E76
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/284B98B1AA81B4FF87257B34006B8ECF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C64349CD9A58431787257B480071AFA8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6463DA298304CADE87257B480071A8E2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B89FEBF16666A6D787257B34006B9E76
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/284B98B1AA81B4FF87257B34006B8ECF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C64349CD9A58431787257B480071AFA8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6463DA298304CADE87257B480071A8E2

Bill Comments

feedback