CO HB1249 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the requirement that the state treasurer distribute any federal funds related to the naval oil shale reserve land to specified counties or their federal mineral lease districts.
Title
Anvil Points Federal Mineral Lease Distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1249 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1249 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1249 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1249 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |