CO HB1248 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Irrigation Water Leasing Municipal Pilot Projects
Title
Irrigation Water Leasing Municipal Pilot Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1248 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1248 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1248 to the Finance Committee, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1248 to the Finance Committee, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1248 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1248 to the Finance Committee, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1248 to the Finance Committee, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2013-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |