CO HB1247 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Innovative Motor Vehicle Income Tax Credit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Innovative Motor Vehicle Income Tax Credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1247 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1247 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1247 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1247 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1247, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1247, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1247, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1247, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-15HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-05-08HouseSent to the Governor
2013-05-02SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Passed
2013-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2013-04-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
2013-04-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-04-11HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-09HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-03-21HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2013-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C64EAF0A2C033F4987257AFE0063369A?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C64EAF0A2C033F4987257AFE0063369A/$FILE/1247_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C64EAF0A2C033F4987257AFE0063369A/$FILE/1247te_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C64EAF0A2C033F4987257AFE0063369A/$FILE/1247app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C64EAF0A2C033F4987257AFE0063369A/$FILE/1247_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C64EAF0A2C033F4987257AFE0063369A/$FILE/1247_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C64EAF0A2C033F4987257AFE0063369A/$FILE/1247_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C64EAF0A2C033F4987257AFE0063369A/$FILE/1247_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C64EAF0A2C033F4987257AFE0063369A/$FILE/1247_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/42EE0275EB923B5687257B3500653D46
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/66766699B7016F0E87257B350064BA6F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/09EF62A84F01756A87257B3500649857
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A44B37853816E0E187257B480069A071
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8BB9BB6BB887ED9D87257B48006A08E5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DE6E533C71D8404787257B5900514C7F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D36A7FB2369031F887257B5600775104
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/66766699B7016F0E87257B350064BA6F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/42EE0275EB923B5687257B3500653D46
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/09EF62A84F01756A87257B3500649857
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A44B37853816E0E187257B480069A071
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8BB9BB6BB887ED9D87257B48006A08E5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D36A7FB2369031F887257B5600775104
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DE6E533C71D8404787257B5900514C7F

Bill Comments 750

feedback