CO HB1246 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of food truck businesses by local governments.
Title
Local Government Regulation Of Food Trucks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1246, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1246, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1246, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1246, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1246, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1246, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1246, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1246, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2019-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |