CO HB1243 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the establishment of funding for the program to reintroduce and manage gray wolves in the state from sources other than hunting and fishing license fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wolf Reintroduction Funding With No License Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1243 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1243 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1243 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-20SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-19SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-05-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-01HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1243
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1243_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1243_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1243_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1243_rv2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1243_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1243_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1243_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1243_hs3.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1243_r1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4f9824aa0392132a872586aa006c0696-hb21-1243-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9911c12f00444682872586d2004e82d9-hb21-1243-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1243vote54fc0a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9506928d6544fd97872586da00725a3a-hb21-1243-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1243vote556511

Bill Comments 750

feedback