CO HB1242 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Provider Integration Of Service
Title
Medicaid Provider Integration Of Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations, on a 10-3 roll call vote. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations, on a 10-3 roll call vote. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-04-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations | |
2011-04-20 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-19 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-11 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-08 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-22 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment + Appropriations |