CO HB1239 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning continuation under the sunset law of the environmental management system permit program, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations of the sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies by allowing the program to repeal.
Title
Sunset Environmental Management System Permit Program
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Landgraf [R] | Sen. Ray Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1239 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1239 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1239 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1239 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-01 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/28/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |