CO HB1237 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the assignment of certain children and youth to managed care service areas under the medical assistance act.
Title
Medicaid Managed Care Assignment For Child Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1237 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1237 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1237 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1237 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-11 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-05-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-11 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |