CO HB1237 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the requirements regarding the preparation of a cost-benefit analysis as administered by the department of regulatory agencies, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2017 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Continue Cost-benefit Analysis For Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Recede (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Repass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Adhere (Y: 34 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1237 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Repass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Adhere (Y: 34 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1237 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Adherence - Result was to Recede |
2018-04-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Adhere |
2018-04-06 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/09/2018 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Referred to Appropriations - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/28/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |