CO HB1237 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Guard Quarters & Billeting Fund
Title
National Guard Quarters & Billeting Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-05 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-21 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance | |
2011-03-25 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs + Finance + Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations |