CO HB1227 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an extension of demand-side management goals for investor-owned utilities as set by the public utilities commission.
Title
Electric Demand-side Management Program Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1227, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment I). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1227, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: This is a substitute motion to refer House Bill 17-1227 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: This is a substitute motion to refer House Bill 17-1227 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1227 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1227, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment I). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1227, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: This is a substitute motion to refer House Bill 17-1227 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: This is a substitute motion to refer House Bill 17-1227 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1227 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2017-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |