CO HB1225 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Senate Committee on Legislative Council Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Senate Committee on Legislative Council Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a transportation legislation review committee hearing on the effects that a retail electric service provider's participation in a regional transmission organization would have in Colorado.
Title
Electric Regional Transmission Organization Hearing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 17-1225 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - Joint - Legislative Council: Postpone House Bill 17-1225 indefinitely. (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer House Bill 17-1225, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - Joint - Legislative Council: Postpone House Bill 17-1225 indefinitely. (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer House Bill 17-1225, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legislative Council Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2017-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |