CO HB1222 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Family Care Act Family Medical Leave Eligibility
Title
Family Care Act Family Medical Leave Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1222 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1222 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1222 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2013-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |