CO HB1218 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the licensing of hearing aid providers, and, in connection therewith, implementing recommendations contained in the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Continue Hearing Aid Providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1218 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1218 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1218 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1218 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1218, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1218, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-11SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-06-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-08SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Finance
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1218
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1218_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1218_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1218_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1218_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1218_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1218_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f12954a8b8257958725851a00788385-hb20-1218-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f12954a8b8257958725851a00788385-hb20-1218-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f12954a8b8257958725851a00788385-hb20-1218-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3e128a852b2e24df87258529005c8370-hb20-1218-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f656d5c39dae3788725857c0061c82a-hb20-1218-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1218vote042c1c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/103a2cc13338b3a787258582001876dd-hb20-1218-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d8004f017e679e2f872585820069c442-hb20-1218-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1218vote58103b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1218vote126169
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1218vote127ef0

Bill Comments

feedback