CO HB1218 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an expansion of the state's ability to share information about state financial institutions with other governmental regulators.
Title
Share Financial Institution Information Other Regulators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1218 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1218 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |