CO HB1217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the elimination of the two percent increase in the member contribution rate to the public employees' retirement association for members in the local government division of the association.
Title
PERA Public Employees' Retirement Association Local Government Division Member Contribution Rate
Sponsors
Rep. KC Becker [D] | Sen. Lois Court [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1217 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1217 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-03-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |