CO HB1215 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Surplus Lines Insurance Fed Conformity
Title
Surplus Lines Insurance Fed Conformity
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Gerou [R] | Sen. Mary Hodge [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1215, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1215, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1215, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1215, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-04-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-15 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations | |
2012-03-06 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-05 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-16 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |