CO HB1213 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the department of agriculture's regulatory functions related to persons who work with agricultural products, and, in connection therewith, implementing recommendations contained in the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies concerning the "Commodity Handler Act" and the "Farm Products Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Commodity Handler And Farm Products Acts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1213 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1213 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1213 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1213, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Governor Signed
2020-06-26 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-13SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-11SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-10SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-06-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-04HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to Finance
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1213
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1213_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1213_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1213_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1213_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1213_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1213_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/77c3355c2cd8350e87258575006dc0fe-hb20-1213-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/47769dba0ed36d968725857d007431eb-hb20-1213-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9d996d3a9814bf63872585810053b5c9-hb20-1213-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1213vote58dca0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/515bae73a54111fb872585830067b839-hb20-1213-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c89aaae9f15cb35e872585840050d6d4-hb20-1213-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1213vote1a77aa
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1213vote557e72
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1213vote5d957a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1213vote5db45e

Bill Comments

feedback