CO HB1213 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Escape From Community Corrections Program
Title
Escape From Community Corrections Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1213 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1213 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment B), which strikes everything below the enacting clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment B), which strikes everything below the enacting clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1213 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment B), which strikes everything below the enacting clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment B), which strikes everything below the enacting clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-27 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-23 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-18 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2012-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-17 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-16 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-12 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-10 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |