CO HB1207 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the regulation of private investigators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Regulation Of Private Investigators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 15 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1207 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-11 Governor Vetoed
2020-07-02 Sent to the Governor
2020-07-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-07-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-08SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-03-09HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1207
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1207_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1207_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1207_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1207_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1207_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1207_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/93f636f1889ed9298725850c007c6939-hb20-1207-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6b5bd1345dbcdb42872585260071d26f-hb20-1207-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e823656994a774e58725857c0061b38e-hb20-1207-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1207vote5dfedc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1207vote5ac587
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/be50eb5a59e65e2387258582001470c2-hb20-1207-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bea24fbe134e7aa5872585820069a273-hb20-1207-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1207vote57d2de

Bill Comments

feedback