CO HB1207 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CDPHE Household Medication Take-back Program
Title
CDPHE Household Medication Take-back Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment - $5000 GF The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations. This motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations. This motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment - $5000 GF The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations. This motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Appropriations. This motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1207 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-06 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-22 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2014-03-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-02-13 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |