CO HB1204 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Premarital And Marital Agreements Act
Title
Uniform Premarital And Marital Agreements Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt the first report of the first conference committee, which amends the rerevised version of the bill (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt the first report of the first conference committee, which amends the rerevised version of the bill (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt the first report of the first conference committee, which amends the rerevised version of the bill (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-29 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2013-04-19 | House | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2013-04-11 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-21 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2013-02-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |