CO HB1203 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Private Custodian Seal Criminal Records
Title
Private Custodian Seal Criminal Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1203 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-02-23 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-22 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-02-21 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-17 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |