CO HB1202 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approp For Change Order Prior To Work
Title
Approp For Change Order Prior To Work
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1202 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1202 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1202 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1202 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1202 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1202 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1202 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-14 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2011-02-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-14 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |