CO HB1201 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning providing home owners in a mobile home park the opportunity to purchase the park under specified circumstances.
Title
Mobile Home Park Residents Opportunity To Purchase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2020-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-02-25 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |