CO HB1201 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
BOCES & Centralized Operating Services Grants
Title
BOCES & Centralized Operating Services Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1201 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1201 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to conceptually amend the bill to reduce the fiscal impact from $5 million to $2 million and change the grant amount from $500,000 to $250,000 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1201 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to conceptually amend the bill to reduce the fiscal impact from $5 million to $2 million and change the grant amount from $500,000 to $250,000 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |
2015-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |