CO HB1198 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Computer Courses Fulfill Graduation Requirements
Title
Computer Courses Fulfill Graduation Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Pabon [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment to replace safety clause with a petition clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment to replace safety clause with a petition clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-04-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-04-11 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-01 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2016-04-01 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2016-03-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |