CO HB1193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning behavioral health supports for high-risk families, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Health Supports For High-risk Families

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1193 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1193 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1193, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1193 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-08HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-02-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1193
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1193_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1193_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1193_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1193_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1193_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1193_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/163e3be8908b8330872583b700721559-hb19-1193-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d68c42da55393a06872583de004b7bf0-hb19-1193-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d68c42da55393a06872583de004b7bf0-hb19-1193-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1193vote565d2e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb0c9be516fb16ce872583e700047e83-hb19-1193-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a7dd6e190c00d8e6872583e8004db3cb-hb19-1193-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1193vote670d2d

Bill Comments

feedback