CO HB1183 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend Conservation Easement Tax Credit Cap
Title
Extend Conservation Easement Tax Credit Cap
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1183 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2013-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-13 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |