CO HB1178 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning increasing the speed limit on rural state highways where it is safe to do so, and, in connection therewith, directing the department of transportation to identify these highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase Speed Limit On Certain Rural Highways

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 20-1178, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1178, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1178, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27 Governor Signed
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-14SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-03-12SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2020-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-18HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1178
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1178_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1178_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1178_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1178_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1178_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1178_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e8d1acd30d65f1628725851200618ca5-hb20-1178-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1178vote5b7791
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e8d1acd30d65f1628725851200618ca5-hb20-1178-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/87399ea592f6951087258529005cbd1d-hb20-1178-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1178vote54a938
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1178vote604085
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1178vote60522c

Bill Comments

feedback