CO HB1177 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning creation of an extreme risk protection order, and in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extreme Risk Protection Orders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.004) (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1177 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1177, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.025) (Y: 27 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.036) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.046) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.045) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.028) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.030) (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.055) (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.042) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.035) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.037) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.062) (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.038) (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.023) (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.049) (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.022) (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.050) (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.041) (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1177, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1177, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 severed section B, page 1, lines 1 through 3, and lines 6 through 17. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1177, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-21SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-03-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-01HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1177
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1177_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1177_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1177_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1177_rev.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2ae7712887e2dfa2872583a800715a33-hb19-1177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/acf5b54534759e05872583af00531960-hb19-1177-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/acf5b54534759e05872583af00531960-hb19-1177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2ae7712887e2dfa2872583a800715a33-hb19-1177-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2ae7712887e2dfa2872583a800715a33-hb19-1177-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2ae7712887e2dfa2872583a800715a33-hb19-1177-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2ae7712887e2dfa2872583a800715a33-hb19-1177-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote19d290
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote1923dc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote19f36d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote195661
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote1af5fa
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote18c27f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote1a1ba4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote1978a1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote19a430
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote1851e6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote17f102
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote1795bb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote175b30
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote17d1e2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote181ad8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote18726b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote18a1a8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote1837da
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote18f772
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote69252a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bf9c07151c830990872583be0058c436-hb19-1177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d030253b4feb626c872583c2004c2709-hb19-1177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote0eeb9f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote1188ed
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote111eee
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1177vote11462b

Bill Comments

feedback