CO HB1177 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of alternative methods of resolving disputes that arise under the 'Colorado Open Records Act'.
Title
Mediation For Disputes Arising Under CORA Colorado Open Records Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Wist [R] | Rep. Alec Garnett [D] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1177 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1177, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1177, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1177 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1177, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1177, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |