CO HB1176 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the income tax statutes in order to address certain defects and anachronisms.
Title
Income Tax Statute Modification To Address Defects
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Valdez [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1176 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1176 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1176 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1176 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1176 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1176 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2020-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-06 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations |