CO HB1166 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning name-based criminal history record checks, and, in connection therewith, requiring certain persons and entities to submit to a name-based criminal history record check as a condition of employment, appointment, registration, licensure, or certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Name-based Criminal History Record Checks

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-13HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor + Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1166
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1166_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1166_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1166_rn5.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1166_rev.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1ea23a0e296fd691872583a000748a51-hb19-1166-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1ea23a0e296fd691872583a000748a51-hb19-1166-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d011bd8a35ab2dc9872583af0053e155-hb19-1166-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1166vote5b8aea
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/077096eb0c13524f872583c1006c533c-hb19-1166-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback