CO HB1163 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify Enterprise Zone Investment Tax Credit Cap
Title
Clarify Enterprise Zone Investment Tax Credit Cap
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1163 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1163 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1163 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1163 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1163 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1163 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1163 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-19 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2014-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |