CO HB1158 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning insurance coverage for infertility, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Insurance Cover Infertility Diagnosis Treatment Preserve
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1158 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1158 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1158 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1158 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-14 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2020-02-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-12 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |